IL SB2461 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Conversion and Formation of School Districts Article of the School Code. Creates the School District Efficiency Commission. Provides for the membership and support of the Commission. Provides that the purpose of the Commission is to make recommendations to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the public on the optimal number of school districts in this State, the optimal student enrollment amount for a school district, and where reorganization and realignment of school districts would be beneficial in this State; specifies the topics on which the recommendations must focus. Provides that, on or before May 1, 2021, the Commission must vote on its recommendations and submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly. Provides that if the Commission adopts the report recommendations by an affirmative vote of at least 13 of its members, then the Commission's specific recommendations for reorganization of school districts into unit school districts shall be submitted as a petition and filed with the appropriate regional superintendent of schools for approval. Provides that the petition shall then be submitted to the State Superintendent of Education for approval. Repeals the provisions on January 31, 2023. Makes a conforming change in the Article. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH DISTRICT EFFICIENCY COMM
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 11E-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 11E-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2461&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2461.htm |