IL SB2461 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that no later than July 1, 2019, the Department of Children and Family Services shall enter into contracts with public or private agencies or shall complete development for specialized placements for youth in the Department's care who are victims of sex trafficking. Provides that such specialized placements may include, but not be limited to, licensed foster homes, group homes, residential facilities, and secure residential facilities that specialize in providing treatment to children who are victims of sex trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-SPECIALIZED PLACEMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0705
2018-08-03SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-27HouseArrived in House
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback