IL SB2461 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that no later than July 1, 2019, the Department of Children and Family Services shall enter into contracts with public or private agencies or shall complete development for specialized placements for youth in the Department's care who are victims of sex trafficking. Provides that such specialized placements may include, but not be limited to, licensed foster homes, group homes, residential facilities, and secure residential facilities that specialize in providing treatment to children who are victims of sex trafficking.
Title
DCFS-SPECIALIZED PLACEMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0705 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 5.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |