IL SB2459 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides an exception to the use of electronic signatures for transactions involving technical submissions. Defines "technical submissions". Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE WAIVER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
2021-05-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-11HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-23HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villivalam
2021-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to State Government
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
517525-120New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback