IL SB2459 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Drainage Code. Provides that the Lake County Board may dissolve the Seavey Drainage District with a resolution that states: that the district has not imposed a levy for at least 10 years; that there are no outstanding debts of the district that have been filed with the county clerk of Lake County; that no federal or State permit or grant will be impaired by dissolution of the district; and the date of dissolution of the district. Provides that on the date of dissolution of the district, the powers of the former district shall be exercised by the respective municipalities where the various parts of the former district are located and by Lake County for any unincorporated areas contained in the former district. Provides that no later than 60 days after the date of dissolution of the district, Lake County shall notify the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency of the dissolution of the district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LAKE CO-SEAVEY DRAINAGE DIST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-001
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 008-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-04-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-001-000
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie
2018-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 008-001-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 006-001-001
2018-02-14SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7060510-7.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback