IL SB2459 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Drainage Code. Provides that the Lake County Board may dissolve the Seavey Drainage District with a resolution that states: that the district has not imposed a levy for at least 10 years; that there are no outstanding debts of the district that have been filed with the county clerk of Lake County; that no federal or State permit or grant will be impaired by dissolution of the district; and the date of dissolution of the district. Provides that on the date of dissolution of the district, the powers of the former district shall be exercised by the respective municipalities where the various parts of the former district are located and by Lake County for any unincorporated areas contained in the former district. Provides that no later than 60 days after the date of dissolution of the district, Lake County shall notify the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency of the dissolution of the district.
Title
LAKE CO-SEAVEY DRAINAGE DIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0874 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-001-001 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McConchie |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 008-001-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 006-001-001 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Postponed - Government Reform |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |