IL SB2459 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Sets forth the procedure for selecting a successful design-build entity. Provides that the Commission may award a design-build contract to a qualified design-build entity that offers the best value in terms of quality, cost, and proposed time of completion. Authorizes the Commission to enter into competitive negotiations with qualified design-build entities. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC BUILD COMM-DESIGN-BUILD
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-06-01 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-06-01 | First Reading | |
2009-06-01 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2459&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2459.htm |