IL SB2457 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Contains provisions concerning a deduction for income included in the taxpayer's federal adjusted gross income and deemed received under Section 951A (GILTI) or Section 952 (Subpart F) of the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
INC TX-GILTI APPORTIONMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2457&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2457.htm |