IL SB2457 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Provides that group or individual policies of accident and health insurance or managed care plans amended, delivered, issued, or renewed on or after January 1, 2021 (rather than January 1, 2020) shall provide coverage for medically necessary epinephrine injectors. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CODE–EPINEPHRINE INJECTOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 016-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |