IL SB2456 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that beginning with the first payroll of the 102nd General Assembly, the compensation to be paid per year to members of the General Assembly, including additional sums payable per year to officers of the General Assembly, shall be paid bi-monthly. Provides that members who resign before completing the entire term in office shall be compensated on a prorated basis. Provides that members completing the term of a vacancy shall be compensated on a prorated basis. Makes conforming changes.
Title
GA MEMBER COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |