IL SB2455 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,000,000 from the Comprehensive Regional Planning Fund to the Department of Transportation for regional planning purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
$IDOT-COMP REG PLANNING
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Larry Bomke [R] | Sen. Michael Frerichs [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke | |
2009-05-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-05-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-05-21 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-05-20 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-12 | First Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2455&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB2455.pdf |