IL SB2452 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sanitary District Act of 1936. Provides that the Lakes Region Sanitary District may dissolve itself upon entering into a dissolution agreement with Lake County for the county to acquire all of the assets and responsibilities of the district. Provides that upon dissolution of the district, the statutory powers of the former district shall be exercised by the county board of Lake County. Provides that no later than 60 days after the effective date of the dissolution, Lake County shall notify the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency of the dissolution of the Lakes Region Sanitary District and providing a copy of the dissolution agreement to the Agency. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LAKES REGION SANITARY-DISSOLVE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseTo Government Consolidation Analysis Subcommittee
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-27HouseArrived in House
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-001-000
2018-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018
2018-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-02-14SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 007-000-001
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70280533Amended CodeCitation Text
70280533.1New CodeSee Bill Text
70280535Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback