IL SB2450 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Local Library Act. Provides that a board of library trustees may approve, by a two-thirds vote of all the trustees present and voting, transfers from one appropriation to another appropriation of any amount specified, for any object and purpose, and that do not affect the total amount appropriated. Provides that a board of library trustees may make appropriations in excess of those authorized by the budget in order to meet an immediate and unforeseen emergency by a two-thirds vote of all the trustees present and voting. Provides that after the adoption of the annual appropriation ordinance, no other appropriations shall be made at any other time during the fiscal year except as otherwise provided by law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL LIBRARIES-APPROPRIATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Local Government; 005-001-000
2018-02-14SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7554-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback