IL SB2447 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that no later than January 1, 2019, the Auditor General shall initiate a performance audit of the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to determine the Department's compliance with certain requirements concerning Medicaid Managed Care Entities. Provides that the determinations shall include, but not be limited to: (i) whether the Department has developed and applied standardized quality performance measures to Medicaid Managed Care Entities; (ii) whether it has developed and implemented algorithms for automatic assignment of Medicaid enrollees into managed care entities; and (iii) whether the standardized quality performance measures and algorithms developed by the Department use measurable quality metrics, are developed and applied according to the statutory criteria, and are adequately documented. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HFS-REPORT FROM MCO-ELECTRONIC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-004-000
2018-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-18HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Accepted No Action Taken by Rules
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-10HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseSubstitute House Sponsorship Request Filed Pursuant Rule 37(c) - Sen. Laura Murphy
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-10HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-05-10HouseArrived in House
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
2018-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 009-000-000
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-30HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care; 009-000-000
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-30.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback