IL SB2446 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to reimburse psychiatrists and federally qualified health centers for mental health services provided by advanced practice registered nurses certified in psychiatric and mental health nursing to medical assistance recipients via telepsychiatry. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-TELEPSYCHIATRY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-004-000
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-13HouseArrived in House
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback