IL SB2444 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in an Article concerning accident and health insurance. Provides that benefits mandated by the Article do not apply to certain types of insurance policies (rather than specified provisions of the Article do not apply to short-term travel, disability income, long-term care, accident only, or limited or specified disease policies).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CODE-MANDATE APPLICABILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-25SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 012-000-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Insurance
2018-02-14SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155356z.16Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback