IL SB2442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall require every provider of mammography services to, if a patient's mammogram demonstrates dense breast tissue, provide notification to the patient in any summary of the mammography report sent to the patient pursuant to the federal Mammography Quality Standards Act that shall include, but not be limited to, certain information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDPH-MAMMOGRAPHY INFORMATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023102310-697New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback