IL SB2442 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall require every provider of mammography services to, if a patient's mammogram demonstrates dense breast tissue, provide notification to the patient in any summary of the mammography report sent to the patient pursuant to the federal Mammography Quality Standards Act that shall include, but not be limited to, certain information.
Title
IDPH-MAMMOGRAPHY INFORMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |