IL SB2441 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Child Passenger Protection Act. Provides that when any person is transporting a child in this State who is under the age of 2 years in a motor vehicle of the first division or motor vehicle of the second division weighing 9,000 pounds or less, he or she shall be responsible for properly securing the child in a rear-facing child restraint system, unless the child weighs 40 or more pounds or is 40 or more inches tall.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAR-FACING CHILD RESTRAINT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback