IL SB2440 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides than an insurer that amends, delivers, issues, or renews a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or a qualified health plan that provides coverage for hospital or medical treatment and for treatment of a mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorder or condition shall submit an annual report to the Department of Insurance or, with respect to medical assistance, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services on or before March 1 containing specific information. Provides that the Director of Insurance cannot certify an insurer's policy if the insurer fails to submit all specific information required.
Title
INS CD-MENTAL HEALTH/ADDICTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 370c.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2440&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2440.htm |