IL SB2436 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In a provision prohibiting the issuance or renewal of licenses to sell alcoholic liquor at retail within 100 feet of churches, schools, hospitals, and certain other buildings, provides that a local liquor control commissioner may grant an exemption to that prohibition if a local rule or ordinance authorizes the local liquor control commissioner to grant that exemption. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-SALE NEAR CHURCH/SCHOOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-017-001
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-27HouseArrived in House
2018-02-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2018-02-15SenatePostponed - Executive
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback