IL SB2435 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0558
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the First 2021 General Revisory Act. Combines multiple versions of Sections amended by more than one Public Act. Renumbers Sections of various Acts to eliminate duplication. Corrects obsolete cross-references and technical errors. Makes stylistic changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRST 2021 GENERAL REVISORY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0558 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |