IL SB2433 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Currency Exchange Act. Defines "government assistance check", "government check", "payroll check", "printed", and "protected class". Provides additional considerations by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation for determining the maximum rate schedules that can be charged for check cashing and writing of money orders by community currency exchanges and ambulatory currency exchanges. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation's authority to establish rate schedules for check cashing is subject to specified rate caps. Makes other changes. Effective June 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CURRENCY EXCHANGE - CHECKS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0704
2018-08-03SenateEffective Date June 1, 2019
2018-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-04-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-04SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2054051Amended CodeCitation Text
20540519.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback