IL SB2433 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0704
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Currency Exchange Act. Defines "government assistance check", "government check", "payroll check", "printed", and "protected class". Provides additional considerations by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation for determining the maximum rate schedules that can be charged for check cashing and writing of money orders by community currency exchanges and ambulatory currency exchanges. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation's authority to establish rate schedules for check cashing is subject to specified rate caps. Makes other changes. Effective June 1, 2019.
Title
CURRENCY EXCHANGE - CHECKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0704 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date June 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 405 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 405 | 19.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |