IL SB2433 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0572
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Clinical Psychologist Licensing Act from January 1, 2017 to January 1, 2027. Amends the Clinical Psychologist Licensing Act. Requires applicants or licensees to inform the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation of any change of address within 14 days after the change. Authorizes the Department to prescribe forms to be issued for the administration and enforcement of the Act and to conduct investigations related to possible violations of the Act. Removes language requiring that the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation issue a report to the Clinical Psychologists Licensing and Disciplinary Board if he or she takes action contrary to the recommendation of the Board. Provides that a person licensed in another state or jurisdiction of the United States or Canada, holds a doctoral degree in clinical, school, or counseling psychology, and has no disciplinary action taken against his or her license in any jurisdiction may be licensed at the Department's discretion. Provides that a person licensed in any foreign country or province whose standards were substantially equivalent on the date of his or her licensure in the other jurisdiction may be licensed at the recommendation of the Board. Includes the Department in certain disciplinary proceedings. Makes changes to provisions concerning investigations and hearings. Removes the requirement that the Board review reports from a hearing officer within 60 days. Makes changes to provisions concerning rehearings and final orders. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGISTS-SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0572 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2016 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Althoff |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 15 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 15.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 15.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 15 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 15 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |