IL SB2432 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Replaces provisions regarding application for a certificate of authority for an out-of-state bank to merge with a State bank with language that provides that a State bank may merge with and into an out-of-state bank, provided the out-of-state bank causes notice to be filed with the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation not less than 60 days before the proposed effective date of the merger. Makes conforming changes. Amends the Savings Bank Act. Makes changes in provisions concerning parity, out-of-state savings banks establishing branches in this State, examinations, the Savings Bank Regulatory Fund, regulatory fees, orders of the Secretary, and administrative review. Repeals provisions of the Savings Bank Act concerning hearings, records of proceedings, and subpoenas and depositions. Amends the Electronic Fund Transfer Act. Requires that a person who establishes or owns specified cash-dispensing terminals must post a telephone number on the terminal for consumers to call to report problems, along with the telephone number of the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Amends the Corporate Fiduciary Act. Makes changes concerning the office locations of corporate fiduciaries. Amends the Foreign Bank Representative Office Act. Makes changes concerning the definition of "foreign bank". Repeals provisions of the Check Printer and Check Number Act concerning registration of persons other than financial institutions who sell or distribute checks. Repeals provisions of the High Risk Home Loan Act regarding annual reports on default and foreclosure rates on conventional loans. Effective immediately.
Title
BANKING-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Financial Institutions |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 205 | 1006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 1006.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9002.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9002.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9018.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9018.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9018.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 205 | 9018.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 5 | 21.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 5 | 21.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 5 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 616 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 620 | 1-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 650 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 690 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
815 | 137 | 115 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |