IL SB2431 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a taxpayer who has been granted a homestead exemption for veterans with disabilities need not reapply if he or she has been found by the Department of Veterans' Affairs to be permanently and totally disabled.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-VETERANS-DISABILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-169Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback