IL SB2430 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes changes to the definition of investment partnership to provide that a dealer in qualifying investment securities may be considered an investment partnership. Allows a partnership interest to be considered a qualified security if the interest qualifies as a security within the meaning of Section 2(a)(1) of the federal Securities Act of 1933. In provisions requiring that no less than 90% of the investment partnership's gross income shall consist of interest, dividends, and gains from the sale or exchange of qualifying investment securities, provides that that includes the distributive share of partnership income from lower-tier partnership interests and does not include income from partnerships that are operating at a federal taxable loss. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] |
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Margaret Croke [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |