IL SB2429 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide dental services to an adult who is otherwise eligible for assistance under the medical assistance program. Provides that targeted dental services, as set forth in a specified exhibit in a federal consent decree, that are provided to adults under the medical assistance program shall be reimbursed at the rates set forth in a specified column in the exhibit for targeted dental services that are provided to persons under the age of 18 under the medical assistance program. Requires the Department to actively monitor the contractual relationship between Managed Care Organizations (MCOs) and a dental administrator contracted by an MCO to provide dental services. Contains provisions concerning the Department's adoption of appropriate data and measures; the inclusion of certain dental performance measures in the Department's Health Plan Comparison Tool and Illinois Medicaid Plan Report Card; and the collection of information about the types of contracted, broad-based care coordination occurring between a MCO and any dental administrator. Prohibits a health plan from attempting to limit the right of medical assistance recipients to obtain dental services from a qualified Medicaid provider. Prohibits the Department from adopting a rule or entering into a contract that prohibits a licensed dentist or dental hygienist from receiving reimbursement under the medical assistance program for a dental encounter. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-ADULT DENTAL SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 039-014-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Aquino
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-002-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-001-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-30Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback