IL SB2428 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Hunger-Free Students' Bill of Rights Act. Provides that every school in this State shall provide a federally reimbursable lunch to a student of that school who requests the lunch, regardless of whether the student has the ability to pay for the lunch or owes money for earlier lunches. Provides that if a student owes money for 5 or more lunches, a school shall reach out to the parent or guardian of the student to attempt collection of the owed money and to request that the parent or guardian enroll the student in a free or reduced-price lunch program. Provides that a school may not publicly identify or stigmatize a student who cannot pay for a lunch or who owes money for lunches. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUNGER-FREE STUDENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-26SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1092
2018-08-26SenateEffective Date August 26, 2018
2018-08-26SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-010-000
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-044-000
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-21HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-005-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-009-001
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 009-002-001
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Education
2018-02-07SenateAssigned to Education
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2428&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2428.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2428eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2428enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1092.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2428sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2428sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2428ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2428_05012018_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2428_05232018_021000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2428ham001_05302018_023000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback