IL SB2424 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0556
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0556
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Railroad Supplier Diversity Act. Adds the National Railroad Passenger Corporation (doing business as Amtrak) to the list of entities that may report to the Illinois Commerce Commission under the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
RR SUPPLIER DIVERSITY-AMTRAK
Sponsors
Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Eva Dina Delgado [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0556 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
610 | 140 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |