IL SB2424 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0924
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Continuum of Care Services for the Developmentally Disabled Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DIVERSION-FACILITY-BASED CARE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0924
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-04SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210421Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback