IL SB2411 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSPORTATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-003-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-003-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62551-100Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback