IL SB2399 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals language making certain provisions for reassignment by dealers applicable to salvage certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH-CD-SALVAGE CERTIFICATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023
2023-03-10SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023
2023-03-08SenateDo Pass Transportation; 018-000-000
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Transportation
2023-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-118Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback