IL SB2388 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Savings Bank Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning rules and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
2018-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2052056014Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback