IL SB2382 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Navigator Certification Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-04-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151211Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback