IL SB2380 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0870
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMAL WELFARE ACT-MICROCHIP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0870
2018-08-14SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-14SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
2018-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture
2018-05-24SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Holmes
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Agriculture
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22051-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2380&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0870.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2380ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2380_04192018_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2380_05232018_017000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2380ham002_05302018_022001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2380ham001_05302018_022000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback