IL SB2378 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0970
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community Self-Revitalization Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE AND COMMUNITY RELATIONS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0970
2018-08-19SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-19SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-27HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
503501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback