IL SB2378 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Employees’ Retirement System for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
$SERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0726 |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2012 |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 034-025-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 034-025-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-004-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 |
2012-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-054-000 |
2012-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-General Services Committee; 008-005-000 |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2012-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-005-001 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations I; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 31, 2011 |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations I; 007-005-000 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |