IL SB2376 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Assessed Clean Energy Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COOK WATER INFRASTRUCTURE FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 43 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13SenateMotion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-11-13SenatePlaced Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
2018-08-24SenateGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-001
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000
2018-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-043-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Environment; 011-008-000
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-001-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-18SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback