IL SB2370 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following changes: Further amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Replaces certain references to juveniles as "wards" with references to juveniles as "youth in care". Adds an effective date provision of January 1, 2023.
Title
DETENTION-DCFS WARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0654 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |