IL SB2367 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER ACT-DHS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2018-04-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback