IL SB2365 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on November 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0595
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Includes references to the reduction of thermal load in the definitions of "energy efficiency" and "renewable energy resources". Makes corresponding changes to the definition of "Energy Efficiency Project" in the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUB UTIL-ENERGY EFFICIENCY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-11-07 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-15SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0595
2013-11-15SenateEffective Date June 1, 2014
2013-11-15SenateGovernor Approved
2013-11-08SenateSent to the Governor
2013-11-07SenatePassed Both Houses
2013-11-07SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000
2013-11-07Senate3/5 Vote Required
2013-11-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2013-11-07SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2013-11-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2013-11-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2013-11-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2013-11-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2013-11-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 7, 2013
2013-11-06SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2013-11-06HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-001
2013-11-06House3/5 Vote Required
2013-11-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2013-11-06SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr.
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente
2013-11-05HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr.
2013-11-05HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2013-11-05HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000
2013-11-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2013-11-05HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Cross
2013-11-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross
2013-11-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr.
2013-11-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2013-11-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-11-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2013-11-01HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2013-11-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick
2013-10-31HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Al Riley
2013-10-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-10-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2013-10-30HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2013-10-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2013
2013-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2013-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
2013-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
2013-04-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-04-29HouseFirst Reading
2013-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2013-04-25HouseArrived in House
2013-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2013-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2013-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2013-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Harmon
2013-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Sen. Don Harmon
2013-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
2013-04-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2013-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2013-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2013-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2013-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2013-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2013-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2013-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Energy; 014-000-000
2013-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy
2013-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy
2013-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy
2013-04-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013
2013-04-16SenateSecond Reading
2013-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2013-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2013-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2013-04-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2013-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2013
2013-03-14SenateDo Pass Energy; 016-000-000
2013-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2013-03-05SenateAssigned to Energy
2013-03-01SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin
2013-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2013-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
2013-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2013-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2013-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs
2013-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2013-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2013-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2013-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
203501825-65Amended CodeCitation Text
2038551-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2365&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365sam003.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365sam004.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365ham002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2365enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/98/098-0595.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB2365_04242013_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800SB2365_11062013_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB2365_11072013_041000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback