IL SB2364 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-09 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-045-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-09 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-045-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Provides that the Pretrial Practices Data Oversight Board shall start collection of quarterly, county-level data on specified topics on July 1, 2023. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a law enforcement officer shall issue a citation in lieu of custodial arrest, upon proper identification, for a person accused of traffic offense, a Class B misdemeanor, a Class C misdemeanor, a petty offense, or a business offense, unless the law enforcement officer, in the law enforcement officer's discretion, reasonably determines the accused: (1) poses a specific, real, and present threat to the safety of the community or any person or persons; or (2) has a medical or mental health issue that poses a risk to the safety of the accused. Amends the Pretrial Services Act. Removes language requiring that pretrial services agencies to submit findings and recommendations to assess the need or financial security to assure the defendant's appearance at later proceedings. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that language concerning the imposition of a mandatory supervised release term for a Class 3 or Class 4 felony takes effect on March 1, 2023 (instead of July 1, 2022). Creates the Commission on Pretrial Implementation within the Illinois Sentencing Policy Advisory Council; sets membership of the Commission and provides reporting requirements. In provisions concerning electronic monitoring and home detention, requires that a person ordered to pretrial home confinement must be provided with movement spread out over no fewer than 2 periods (instead of 2 days) per week. Provides that the Sentencing Policy Advisory Council shall provide administrative support to the Commission. Provides that the periods of time shall be determined by the supervising authority and authorizes the supervising authority to monitor the participant's location during any period of authorized movement. Provides that if a person on pretrial home confinement is charged with a forcible felony, the State may file a verified motion to deny the participant movement. Requires the court to hold a hearing and provides that the court shall grant the motion only if the court finds by clear and convincing evidence that, based on the totality of the circumstances, movement should be denied. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM PRO-MISDEMEANANT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-045-000 |
2022-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-006-000 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-08 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 104A-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 104A-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 104A-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | 104A-4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
725 | 5 | Art. 104A headin | New Code | See Bill Text |