IL SB2364 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning an early childhood education block grant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2020-03-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-03-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2020-03-06SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
2020-02-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2020
2020-02-20SenateSecond Reading
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020
2020-02-19SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2020-02-05SenateAssigned to Executive
2020-01-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-01-15SenateFirst Reading
2020-01-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10551C-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback