IL SB2364 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51201.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback