IL SB2363 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE TREAS-PREFERENCE-SCORING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51001-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback