IL SB2363 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0969
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE TREAS-PREFERENCE-SCORING
Sponsors
Sen. James Clayborne [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0969 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date August 19, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-037-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |