IL SB2363 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Females, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Specifies that a board of trustees of a community college district qualifies as a State university for the purposes of the Act. Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Provides that a community college district does not qualify as a political subdivision for the purposes of the Act. Deletes a provision that exempted from the Act's notice, evaluation, and selection requirements those political subdivisions that have a satisfactory relationship for services with one or more firms. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-MINORITY PROCUREMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Executive |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; 3-9(b) |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 510 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 510 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 510 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 510 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |