IL SB2362 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-LEASE-PROPERTY-UIC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-001
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-001
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-001
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2362&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2362.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2362eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2362enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2362sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2362ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2362ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2362_04262018_083000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2362_05302018_023000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2362ham002_05312018_011000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback